FRIENDS OF CEDAR PARK SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organise social events for parents and/or pupils to build/maintain the school community.Develop and maintain the schools links with local/extended community.Develop effective relationships by ensuring parents views are represented.Encourage parents to become involved in their children's education.Raise funds to provide goods and services to support the school and advance education of the pupils
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 29 April 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Gregory | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Milner | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nick Prior-Davis | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.44k | £8.20k | £7.65k | £23.77k | £28.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.44k | £9.00k | £2.61k | £5.87k | £28.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 22 June 2024 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 08 June 2023 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 02 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
To advance the education of pupils in the School in particular by: Developing effective relationships between the staff parents and others associated with the school; Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the School and advance the education of the pupils.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cedar Park School
Cedar Avenue
Hazlemere
HIGH WYCOMBE
Buckinghamshire
HP15 7EF
- Phone:
- 01494 711918
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window