NORTH WEST HACHNOSAS KALLOH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve poverty particularly by assisting poor brides and grooms with funding to help them meet their expenses in setting up home and for such other purposes as are for the public benefit and recognised as charitable according to English law
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Barnet
Governance
- 05 July 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Bernard Knopfler | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
NOMI KLOR | Trustee |
|
||||||
RIVKA IDA DUNNER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.80k | £74.80k | £83.00k | £94.72k | £459.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £118.80k | £65.45k | £103.14k | £105.98k | £196.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 26 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY PARTICULARLY BY ASSISTING POOR BRIDES AND POOR GROOMS WITH FUNDING TO HELP THEM MEET THEIR EXPENSES IN SETTING UP HOME AND FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
142 BRIDGE LANE
LONDON
NW11 9JS
- Phone:
- 02084581451
- Email:
- familyklor@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window