Financial history DAVAR - THE JEWISH CULTURAL INSTITUTE IN BRISTOL AND THE SOUTH WEST

Charity number: 1136652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.87k £2.09k £2.37k £2.84k £2.85k
Total expenditure £1.39k £1.66k £2.00k £3.97k £2.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A