EUROPEAN MUSEUM FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was set up with the purpose that the funds of the charity may be applied to maintain, improve and advance public education and in particular to assist and support museums to promote and encourage interest in such museums. This did not include museums operated for private profit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Armenia
- Azerbaijan
- Belgium
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Croatia
- Denmark
- Estonia
- Finland
- France
- Georgia
- Germany
- Greece
- Italy
- Latvia
- Netherlands
- Portugal
- Slovenia
- Spain
- Switzerland
Governance
- 08 July 2010: Standard registration
- 06 May 2011: Funds received from 282158 THE EUROPEAN MUSEUM FORUM
- EMF (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adriana Ofelia del Jesus Munoz | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Leontine Meijer-Van Mensch | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Johannes Jacobus Looijen | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michal Wisniewski | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amina Krvavac | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joan Roca Albert | Trustee | 02 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Heal | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.09k | £57.64k | £45.30k | £92.10k | £95.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.97k | £38.89k | £53.68k | £66.29k | £66.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
4.1 TO MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE AND SUPPORT MUSEUMS WHICH ARE NOT CONDUCTED FOR PRIVATE PROFIT; 4.2 OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE WHICH ARE IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY INCLUDING THOSE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Museu de Portimao
Rua D Carlos I/Zona Ribeirinha
Portimao
Portimao
Algarve
- Phone:
- 01514784559
- Email:
- emf@europeanforum.museum
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window