THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY BROOKFIELD, LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship, open to all; the provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation; pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved; teaching of Christianity, through sermons, courses and small groups; supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
54 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Camden
Governance
- 12 July 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARY BROOKFIELD PCC, LONDON, (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Damien David Robert Mason | Chair | 09 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marie Papworth | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM DAVID BROWNE JOHNSON | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
LYDIA CHARLOTTE KEMBER | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
NOEL GAVIN CASEY | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hon Ian Russell MacGregor | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Dominic Ronald Butt | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER THOMAS LINTON DANN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICHOLAS MARTIN BETHUNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICOLA SIAN PITTAM | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.54k | £164.67k | £197.32k | £221.89k | £258.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.02k | £182.87k | £175.84k | £234.87k | £242.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
85 Dartmouth Park Road
London
NW5 1SL
- Phone:
- 02072675941
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window