CARDIFF UNIVERSITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The University provides Higher Education to the general public which will also include numerous research activities. For more detail see the Public Benefit Statement within the Annual Financial Statements.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£636,380,471
Donations and legacies | £1.40m | |
Charitable activities | £534.44m | |
Other trading activities | £74.74m | |
Investments | £9.67m | |
Other | £16.13m |
Total expenditure:
£611,469,000
Raising funds | £4.20m | |
Charitable activities | £528.39m | |
Other | £78.87m |
-£5,624,091 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £51,857,670 from 385 government contract(s) and £189,690,348 from 1094 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £83.07m | |
Charitable expenditure | £528.39m | |
Retained for future use | £24.91m |
People

6171 Employee(s)
22 Trustee(s)
2130 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 484 |
£70k to £80k | 272 |
£80k to £90k | 108 |
£90k to £100k | 56 |
£100k to £110k | 51 |
£110k to £120k | 30 |
£120k to £130k | 20 |
£130k to £140k | 18 |
£140k to £150k | 13 |
£150k to £200k | 33 |
£200k to £250k | 2 |
£350k to £400k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cardiff
Governance
- 13 July 2010: Standard registration
- 18 November 2024: Funds received from 1174941 CURRICULUM FOR COHESION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Caroline Casella | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Micaela Louise Panes | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Madison Poppy Johnston Hutchinson | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Katherine Helen Shelton | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Peggy Button | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Andrew Joseph Mann | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sian Rees | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Wendy Joan Larner | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Juan Pereiro Viterbo | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Urfan Khaliq | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catrin Mair Lewis Wood | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Wilton Weaver | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Maxwell Lewis | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Wood | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Martin Selway | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Rankin | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Younge | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Damian Walford Davies | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SHAKESHAFT | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Judith Anne Fabian | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Agnes Xavier-Phillips JP DL | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £538.50m | £568.81m | £604.59m | £634.17m | £635.21m | |
|
Total expenditure | £644.83m | £499.56m | £573.20m | £725.31m | £611.47m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £46.42m | £44.33m | £41.66m | £46.07m | £51.86m | |
|
Income from government grants | £131.69m | £165.05m | £195.19m | £187.60m | £189.69m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.57m | £784.00k | £2.74m | £1.24m | £1.40m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £62.72m | £58.62m | £47.14m | £56.56m | £74.74m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £459.02m | £497.24m | £543.52m | £561.29m | £534.44m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £403.00k | £166.00k | £288.00k | £267.00k | £1.18m | |
|
Income - Investment | £6.26m | £5.91m | £4.38m | £5.73m | £9.67m | |
|
Income - Other | £7.94m | £6.27m | £6.83m | £9.35m | £16.13m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £656.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £458.61m | £465.66m | £485.76m | £509.36m | £528.39m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.58m | £2.55m | £2.58m | £2.85m | £4.20m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.51m | £1.80m | £518.00k | £481.00k | £1.51m | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £2.94m | £2.89m | £2.92m | £3.35m | £3.39m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £925.00k | £1.03m | £1.25m | £1.99m | £3.48m | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £183.65m | £31.36m | £84.86m | £213.10m | £78.87m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £782.83m | £846.80m | £934.28m | £949.06m | £952.27m | |
|
Long-term investments | £11.83m | £9.26m | £7.60m | £9.25m | £15.21m | |
|
Other assets | £451.45m | £393.00m | £521.27m | £521.96m | £488.86m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£200.25m | -£187.31m | -£188.81m | -£233.45m | -£180.33m | |
|
Total liabilities | £459.17m | £444.15m | £597.86m | £598.15m | £598.49m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 20 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 20 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARTER ADOPTED 7 OCTOBER 1884
Charitable objects
1. THE OBJECTS OF CARDIFF UNIVERSITY SHALL BE: (1) TO ADVANCE KNOWLEDGE AND EDUCATION BY TEACHING AND RESEARCH AND BY THE EXAMPLE AND INFLUENCE OF ITS CORPORATE LIFE; (2) TO PROVIDE INSTRUCTION AND COURSES OF STUDY FOR PERSONS SEEKING TO QUALIFY FOR DEGREES AND OTHER AWARDS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF WALES, OF CARDIFF UNIVERSITY, AND OF OTHER UNIVERSITIES AND FOR OTHER PERSONS; (3) TO PROMOTE AND MAKE PROVISION FOR RESEARCH AND FOR SUCH METHODS OF ADVANCING, DISSEMINATING, PRESERVING AND APPLYING KNOWLEDGE AS MAY BE DECIDED UPON FROM TIME TO TIME BY CARDIFF UNIVERSITY; (4) TO DEVELOP THE CHARACTER OF THE STUDENTS BY VIRTUE OF ITS CORPORATE LIFE; (5) TO PROMOTE, ITSELF OR JOINTLY WITH OTHERS, HEALTH AND WELFARE WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO THE NEEDS OF WALES; (6) TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE SOCIAL, CULTURAL AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT OF WALES AND THE UNITED KINGDOM. 2. CARDIFF UNIVERSITY SHALL BE A TEACHING, RESEARCH, EXAMINING AND DEGREE-AWARDING BODY AND SHALL HAVE POWER TO DO ALL LAWFUL ACTS INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) POWER: (1) TO TAKE OVER ALL PROPERTY, RIGHTS, BENEFITS AND LIABILITIES OF, INCLUDING PROPERTY PREVIOUSLY HELD ON TRUST BY, UNIVERSITY OF WALES COLLEGE OF MEDICINE OR ANY OTHER PERSON OR BODY WHOSE OBJECTS ARE NOT INCONSISTENT WITH THIS OUR CHARTER; (2) TO MAKE AWARDS AND CONFER DEGREES AND OTHER DISTINCTIONS OF CARDIFF UNIVERSITY AND FOR GOOD CAUSE TO DEPRIVE A PERSON OF AN AWARD, DISTINCTION OR DEGREE OF CARDIFF UNIVERSITY.
Area of benefit
CARDIFF
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cardiff University
University Secretary's Office
Cardiff
CF10 3AT
- Phone:
- 029 20874297
- Email:
- Governance@cardiff.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window