AMERSHAM FREE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In fulfilling the purpose of a Church (principally the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist and United Reformed Church denominations) the Charity engages in a range of activities including (but not restricted to) the conduct of regular public worship, prayer, Bible study, preaching and teaching.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
91 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 05 August 2010: Previously excepted registration
- AMERSHAM FREE CHURCH (INTERDENOMINATIONAL) (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV IAN GREEN | Chair | 04 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Peter Burdin | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Sara Autton | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Richards | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Underwood | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Heather McIntyre | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Munro ACMA | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Carolynn Elizabeth Croisdale-Appleby | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stanislaw Leslie Chrol-Frolowicz | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Ruby Richardson | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amela Nandanie Munro MBACP | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Deirdre Clark | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ELDRIDGE | Trustee | 20 July 2012 |
|
|||||
Rev ERNA STEVENSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £177.07k | £141.20k | £152.65k | £191.74k | £288.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £156.97k | £100.31k | £132.37k | £177.55k | £192.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MAY 2010 AS AMENDED ON 23 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST UNION OF GREAT BRITAIN ("THE BUGB") AND THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ("THE URC") DENOMINATIONS. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND / OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD. THE CHURCH SHALL EXPRESS ITS AIMS IN A MISSION STATEMENT WHICH SHALL BE IN CONFORMITY WITH ITS CONSTITUTION AND MAY BE REVIEWED PERIODICALLY BY A CHURCH MEETING
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Amersham Free Church
Woodside Road
AMERSHAM
Buckinghamshire
HP6 6AJ
- Phone:
- 01494725339
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window