Financial history CHRIST CHURCH WITH ST PHILIP (WORCESTER PARK)

Charity Number: 1137612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £184.83k £122.64k £157.30k £186.50k £197.59k
Total expenditure £184.60k £157.32k £184.41k £191.89k £198.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A