THE LAKES FLYING COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish and maintain a heritage centre for the benefit of the public, that will tell the story of early powered seaplanes with the emphasis on the history of their early development and their activities in and around Windermere and the Lake District
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 27 October 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN JOHN NORMAN GEE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Alison Nicole Sandeman | Trustee | 22 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Kenneth Lodge McDonnell | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Christine Hughes | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Derek Andrew Wrathall | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robin Peter Caddick | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Miriam Tripp | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Nixon | Trustee | 13 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN BRUCE LEGGE | Trustee | 06 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETULA ANNE GEE | Trustee | 15 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
SIR HUMPHRY WAKEFIELD BT FRGS MA CANTAB | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.82k | £39.38k | £7.63k | £75.99k | £52.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.37k | £24.01k | £2.80k | £64.99k | £41.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/03/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/06/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 MAR 2016 as amended on 24 May 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY:- 1) THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A HERITAGE CENTRE, THAT WILL TELL THE STORY OF SEAPLANES WITH THE EMPHASIS ON THE HISTORY OF THEIR EARLY DEVELOPMENT AND THEIR ACTIVITIES IN AND AROUND WINDERMERE AND THE LAKE DISTRICT; 2) THE CONSTRUCTION, DISPLAYS AND FLIGHTS OF AN AIRWORTHY REPLICA OF WATERBIRD - THE FIRST AEROPLANE TO SUCCESSFULLY TAKE OFF AND ALIGHT ON WATER OUTSIDE OF FRANCE AND THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON 25/11/1911 AT WINDERMERE; 3) EXHIBITING THE REPLICA OF WATERBIRD IN PERPETUITY; 4) PROVIDING HISTORICAL AND TECHNICAL INFORMATION REGARDING THE HISTORICAL CONTEXT AND DESIGN OF WATERBIRD.
Area of benefit
WINDERMERE AND THE LAKE DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bennett Brooks & Co Ltd
St. Georges Court
Winnington Avenue
NORTHWICH
CW8 4EE
- Phone:
- 07786918176
- Email:
- ijngee@googlemail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window