THE YORK DIOCESAN CLERGY DEPENDANTS FUND

Charity number: 1137992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Makes grants to certain classes of people with the aim of relieving need

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £6,057
Total expenditure: £3,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of York
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire
  • Kingston Upon Hull City
  • North Yorkshire
  • Redcar And Cleveland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 September 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE ARCHBISHOP OF YORK'S CLERGY WIDOWS AND ORPHANS FUND (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rt Revd Dr Eleanor Sanderson Trustee 22 September 2022
THE YORK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Received: On time
The Venerable Amanda Bloor Trustee 15 June 2020
THE YORK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Received: On time
THE YORK DIOCESAN MINISTERS' RELIEF (2009) FUND
Received: On time
THE TURNER HUDSON RETIRED CLERGY FUND
Received: On time
THE VEN ANDY BROOM Trustee 06 October 2014
ANN WATSON'S TRUST
Received: On time
THE TURNER HUDSON RETIRED CLERGY FUND
Received: On time
CHARITY OF EMILY WILSON-BARKWORTH FOR POOR BENEFICED CLERGY OF THE CHURCH
Received: On time
THE YORK DIOCESAN MINISTERS' RELIEF (2009) FUND
Received: On time
THE YORK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Received: On time
CANON PETER JOHN WARRY Trustee
THE YORK DIOCESAN MINISTERS' RELIEF (2009) FUND
Received: On time
ACTS 435
Received: On time
UNIVERSITY OF YORK CHAPLAINCY CENTRE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.97k £3.90k £3.97k £4.83k £6.06k
Total expenditure £750 £5.75k £1.00k £2.00k £3.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
DIOCESE OF YORK
AMY JOHNSON WAY
CLIFTON MOOR
YORK
YO30 4XT
Phone:
01904699500