Financial history UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH WALES/PRIFYSGOL DE CYMRU

Charity number: 1140312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £198.83m £200.21m £218.93m £233.03m £248.67m
Total expenditure £200.06m £195.00m £215.99m £231.82m £244.93m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.53m £3.37m £4.83m £5.37m £7.40m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £4.05m £4.75m £4.23m £3.45m £3.07m
Income - Charitable activities £175.97m £180.79m £196.32m £202.32m £207.70m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.26m £571.00k £521.00k £4.23m £12.21m
Income - Other £17.55m £14.11m £17.86m £23.03m £25.69m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £200.06m £195.00m £215.99m £231.82m £244.93m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0