Accounts and annual returns THE BEWDLEY CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 501137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 10 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 23 June 2024 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 29 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 01 June 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required