THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE CHURCH OF THE HOLY CROSS, UCKFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved and the housebound. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Taking of religious assemblies in schools. Provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other special need groups. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 03 September 2010: Previously excepted registration
- CHURCH OF THE HOLY CROSS, UCKFIELD (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JOHN CASWALLAN WALL MA | Chair | 21 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Anthony G Simpson | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Davies | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Boag-Morris | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA MARJORIE BONIFACE | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL JOHN IRELAND | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY ANN JEPSON | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|||||
FRANCIS NIGEL WALLACE LL.B | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JILL THORNTON | Trustee | 20 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
EDNA MARY OSBORNE | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA MARY FORDHAM BED Cantab | Trustee | 30 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ELIZABETH WIDDOWSON | Trustee | 09 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN YOUNGMAN | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS DEE JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
TERRY DOUGLAS HALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL LESTER CUERDEN BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN PONTEFRACT | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANN ELIZABETH KENNEDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA LESLEY NOEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.26k | £298.67k | £134.04k | £156.56k | £148.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £156.60k | £124.94k | £150.43k | £152.95k | £158.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CHURCH OF THE HOLY CROSS
BELMONT CENTRE
BELMONT ROAD
UCKFIELD
EAST SUSSEX
TN22 1BP
- Phone:
- 01825764889
- Email:
- holycrossuckfield@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window