BRAIN RESEARCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Brain Research UK (the working name of Brain Research Trust) promotes and supports basic and clinical research into neurological disease which affects one in five people in the UK. We fund ground-breaking research at UK-wide centres of excellence for scientific research into neurological diseases and conditions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,495,000
Donations and legacies | £2.92m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £575.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,260,000
Raising funds | £1.23m | |
Charitable activities | £2.03m | |
Other | £0 |
£543,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £593,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.23m | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.03m | |
Retained for future use | £235.00k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.23m | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.03m | |
Retained for future use | £778.00k |
People

6 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 February 2011: Standard registration
- BRAIN RESEARCH UK (Working name)
- BRT, THE BRT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jim Gollan | Chair | 16 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Vijay Jassal | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Prof Kevin Talbot | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Joanna Wardlaw | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Aoife Regan | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Storrs | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Vernon Wright | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN KROPMAN | Trustee | 15 July 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.50m | £1.75m | £2.03m | £3.20m | £3.50m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.67m | £3.31m | £3.25m | £3.01m | £3.26m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £184.00k | £682.00k | £593.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.82m | £1.38m | £1.61m | £2.77m | £2.92m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £474 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £40.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £681.00k | £368.00k | £421.00k | £427.00k | £575.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £104.00k | £557.00k | £437.00k | £384.00k | £518.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.46m | £2.59m | £2.40m | £1.82m | £2.03m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.21m | £722.00k | £844.00k | £1.19m | £1.23m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £91.00k | £60.00k | £55.00k | £69.00k | £76.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £2.10m | £2.35m | £2.20m | £1.67m | £1.68m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £78.00k | £37.42k | £87.00k | £84.00k | £84.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £3.00k | £3.00k | £3.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | £13.55m | £14.07m | £14.04m | £13.18m | £13.71m | |
|
Other assets | £1.53m | £2.68m | £2.52m | £2.65m | £3.08m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.19m | £5.17m | £5.93m | £5.83m | £6.02m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/08/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/12/2015 as amended on 16 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT BY ALL AVAILABLE MEANS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT RESEARCH AND INVESTIGATION INTO AND STUDY OF DISEASES OF THE NERVOUS SYSTEM AND ALLIED SUBJECTS, AND PARTICULARLY THE CAUSES, MEANS OF PREVENTION, DIAGNOSIS, METHOD OF TREATMENT AND CURE OF SUCH DISEASES AND PUBLICATION OF SUCH RESEARCH, STUDY AND INVESTIGATION (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS “NEUROLOGICAL RESEARCH”) WHICH TERM SHALL INCLUDE THE PROMOTION AND SUPPORT OF UNIVERSITY COLLEGE LONDON INSTITUTE OF NEUROLOGY (QUEEN SQUARE) AND SUCH OTHER INSTITUTIONS IN WHICH SUCH RESEARCH INVESTIGATION OR STUDY IS OR IS TO BE PURSUED.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED.
Linked charities
- 16 February 2011 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fifth Floor
Holborn Gate
330 High Holborn
London
WC1V 7QH
- Phone:
- 02074049982
- Email:
- info@brainresearchuk.org.uk
- Website:
-
brainresearchuk.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window