SOUTH YORKSHIRE BUILDINGS PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity has recently completed restoration of 42 King Street, Thorne, Near Doncaster. It retains the property and manages as four fully let apartments. The Trust is currently involved in the restoration of the Nonconformist Chapel in the Sheffield General Cemetery, a grade II* listed building on English Heritage's "At Risk" register.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2018
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnsley
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 10 November 1971: Standard registration
- SHEFFIELD ROTHERHAM AND DISTRICT BUILDINGS TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- SOUTH YORKSHIRE HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEN BURLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD CHARLES ANDREW EASTWOOD | Trustee |
|
||||||
PROFESSOR JOHN CLYDE GOODFELLOW BINFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.03k | £19.05k | £21.01k | £3.41k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.43k | £10.39k | £7.78k | £3.86k | £650 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | |||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | |||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | |||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | |||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 MARCH 1971 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 23 JUNE 1971, 10 NOVEMBER 1993 AND 14 SEPTEMBER 1994 AND BY CERTIFICATES OF INCORPORATION[CONTINUED IN REMARKS BOX]
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF SOUTH YORKSHIRE AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE, WHATEVER OF THE ENGLISH HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND SOUTH YORKSHIRE IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS AND ARTEFACTS(INCLUDING ANY STRUCTURE, ERECTION, PART OF ANY BUILDING ANY FEATURE OF A BUILDING CONSISTING OF A MAN-MADE OBJECT OR STRUCTURE FIXED TO A BUILDING OR FORMING PART OF THE LAND AND COMPRISED WITHIN THE CURTILAGE OF A BUILDING) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM).
Area of benefit
SOUTH YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROSE COTTAGE
FOOLOW
EYAM
HOPE VALLEY
S32 5QR
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
SYBPT.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window