THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW'S FARNHAM

Charity number: 1138855
Charity reporting is up to date (70 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Public worship; provision of space for prayer; pastoral work; teaching of Christianity; taking assemblies in schools; providing youth activities; promoting Christianity through events and meetings and literature; promoting mission of Church through various activities ; supporting UK and overseas charities and providing facilities for town meetings and cultural events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £168,968
Total expenditure: £207,123

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 November 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST ANDREW'S PCC FARNHAM (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Uffindell Chair 29 September 2016
THE MYLNE TRUST
Received: On time
BIRCH'S GIFT
Received: On time
CHURCH HOUSE, FARNHAM
Received: On time
FARNHAM CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
SAMPSON'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: 61 days late
GUILDFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Linda Tolmie Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Michael McDougall Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Lynn Attwood Trustee 29 May 2022
None on record
Diana Martin Trustee 09 November 2020
FRIENDS OF ST ANDREWS
Received: On time
Louis Perry Trustee 09 November 2020
None on record
Sian Platt Trustee 09 November 2020
None on record
MARTIN EBERHARDT Trustee 24 March 2019
CHURCH HOUSE, FARNHAM
Received: On time
BIRCH'S GIFT
Received: On time
Emily Claire Hislop Trustee 08 October 2018
None on record
Dr Trevor Charles Walker Trustee 02 April 2017
None on record
Mary Gilda Hollocks Trustee 02 April 2017
None on record
CAROLINE JANE WALKER Trustee 24 April 2016
BIRCH'S GIFT
Received: On time
CHURCH HOUSE, FARNHAM
Received: On time
GEOFFREY CHARLES RIGGS MA MEI Trustee 06 April 2014
THE MYLNE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £294.11k £101.12k £147.01k £164.71k £168.97k
Total expenditure £267.16k £198.71k £194.75k £237.28k £207.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £18.79k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 January 2025 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 January 2025 70 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 18 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 13 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Parish Offices
The Rectory
Upper Church Lane
Farnham
GU9 7PW
Phone:
01252715412