THE OFFICE OF THE INDEPENDENT ADJUDICATOR FOR HIGHER EDUCATION

Charity Number: 1141289
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides independent (free) review scheme for HE students in England/Wales. Deals with complaints from individual students after exhaustion of internal procedures of the HE provider. Where complaints found justified, recommendations for remedy are made and compliance monitored. Also publishes good practice guidance and runs not for profit learning events for HE providers and students' unions.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 April 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • OIA/ OIAHE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Alison Shan Wareing Trustee 01 May 2025
THE UNITE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Professor Osama Khan Trustee 01 May 2025
PLACE2BE
Received: On time
Professor Rachael Elizabeth Langford Trustee 01 May 2025
CARDIFF METROPOLITAN UNIVERSITY
Received: On time
Dr Gwawr Taylor Trustee 01 May 2025
None on record
Alexander Isaac Stanley Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Simongnette Scavazza Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Nicola Ruth Flint Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Adesewa Adebisi Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Martin Stephen Kirke Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
Andrew Frank Chandler Trustee 01 April 2018
WELLBEING IN THE WEALD
Received: On time
Jonathan Nigel Rees Trustee 01 March 2018
None on record
Dr Wendy Victoria Finlay Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
Sophie Jane Williams Trustee 01 March 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.45m £5.88m £6.15m £6.62m £7.35m
Total expenditure £5.69m £5.66m £8.78m £6.57m £7.20m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.42m £5.86m £6.14m £6.61m £7.23m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £22.68k £11.15k £1.46k £14.32k £112.86k
Income - Other £4.26k £5.68k £7.75k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.69m £5.66m £8.78m £6.57m £7.20m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £113.09k £91.45k £100.85k £117.72k £115.66k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £273.40k £193.96k £140.90k £464.14k £338.44k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £4.78m £6.13m £6.59m £4.48m £6.64m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£1.45m -£1.75m -£4.76m -£4.79m £0
Total liabilities £3.74m £4.48m £4.51m £2.64m £4.53m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 15 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 20 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
OFFICE OF THE INDEPENDENT ADJUDICAT
SECOND FLOOR
ABBEY WHARF
57-75 KINGS ROAD
READING
RG1 3AB
Phone:
01189599813