Financial history LADY MARY'S HOME

Charity number: 501247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £4.91k £5.86k £6.57k £5.76k £6.03k
Total expenditure £4.06k £11.81k £8.11k £4.74k £10.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A