MARCH OF THE LIVING (UK) LIMITED

Charity number: 1138604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Education relating to the Holocaust and organising annual visit to Poland and the Death Camps with students

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 October 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • MARCH OF THE LIVING (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SCOTT ANTONY SAUNDERS Chair
None on record
Jacalyn Sank Da Costa Trustee 28 August 2024
None on record
Joseph Woolf Trustee 28 August 2024
None on record
David Anthony Green Trustee 04 December 2023
None on record
Michelle Smaje Trustee 24 March 2020
OHEL SARAH UK
Received: On time
THE RAM FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Anthony Hyams Trustee 29 December 2017
THE RALPH AND MERIEL RICHARDSON FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Dr JAMES MICHAEL SMITH CBE Trustee 10 November 2010
BETH SHALOM LIMITED
Received: On time
AEGIS TRUST
Received: On time
WHITE ROSE
Received: 169 days late
PHYLLIS GREENBERG HEIDEMAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £307.57k £206.14k £629.67k £632.56k £854.85k
Total expenditure £251.69k £129.56k £691.06k £656.34k £879.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £482.06k £483.37k £616.29k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £147.61k £149.19k £238.56k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £680.00k £645.59k £869.12k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £11.06k £10.75k £10.21k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0 £4.32k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets N/A N/A £451 £1 £1
Long-term investments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Other assets N/A N/A £155.16k £59.69k £180.18k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A -£257 -£411 £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A £81.69k £9.40k £154.77k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 30 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 30 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 11 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 11 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 11 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 11 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 22 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 22 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 07 June 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 07 June 2021 38 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
March of the Living (UK) Limited
Schaller House
44A Albert Road
LONDON
NW4 2SJ
Phone:
07855539287