THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DULWICH, ST BARNABAS

Charity number: 1138011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship and provision of sacred space open to all. Pastoral work; teaching of Christianity; taking of religious assemblies in schools.Promotion of Christianity. Promoting the whole mission of the Church through the provision of events and meetings, activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other community groups.Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Southwark

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 September 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST BARNABAS PCC, DULWICH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

24 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Elizabeth Barnett Chair 29 June 2019
None on record
Andrew Peter Statham Gould Trustee 11 May 2025
None on record
Katherine Ann Thomas Trustee 11 May 2025
None on record
Nigel James THORPE Trustee 11 May 2025
None on record
Hannah Phillida Bostock Durno Trustee 11 May 2025
None on record
Rev Gemma Kristina Peah Lin Lau Trustee 20 January 2025
None on record
Rev Susan Rachel Wright Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Amanda Abena French Trustee 07 May 2024
None on record
James George Creasy Trustee 07 May 2024
None on record
Patty Claire Harper Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Clive Thomas Manning Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
CAROLINE SARAH OLDFIELD HAVERS Trustee 01 May 2022
LINK AGE SOUTHWARK
Received: On time
John Brent Trustee 04 May 2021
None on record
James Ross Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Rev Elizabeth Lander Trustee 27 April 2019
None on record
Hilary Sara Robson Maxwell-Hyslop Trustee 27 April 2019
None on record
Rev Timothy Buckler Trustee 27 April 2019
None on record
Robert David Taylor Trustee 27 April 2019
None on record
LORD DONALD ROBIN ALERS HANKEY RIBA FRSA Trustee 23 April 2017
ISLAMIC MUSEUM IN LONDON AND CULTURAL CENTRE
Received: On time
Alison Mary Lester Firth Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
Anne Susan Wear Bishop Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
Mark Annear Trustee 23 March 2014
None on record
David Richard Beamish Trustee 24 October 2013
HANSARD SOCIETY LIMITED
Received: On time
THE SOUTH LONDON CHURCH FUND AND SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Dr KATHERINE ELIZABETH OPIE-SMITH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £512.37k £431.45k £483.05k £529.62k £604.72k
Total expenditure £519.06k £473.75k £527.45k £566.71k £665.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £287.52k N/A N/A £289.25k £290.95k
Income - Other trading activities £3.43k N/A N/A £1.78k £4.50k
Income - Charitable activities £212.46k N/A N/A £110.61k £290.54k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.33k N/A N/A £191.00k £18.73k
Income - Other £643 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £5.00k N/A N/A £0 £10.41k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £461.44k N/A N/A £499.20k £566.66k
Expenditure - Raising funds £57.62k N/A N/A £67.51k £98.75k
Expenditure - Governance £2.22k N/A N/A £2.28k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Long-term investments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Other assets £257.53k N/A N/A £184.71k £116.27k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities £45.57k N/A N/A £33.54k £25.78k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St Barnabas Parish Office
40 Calton Avenue
London
SE21 7DG
Phone:
02086931524