ST DUNSTAN-IN-THE-WEST BELLS FUND

Charity Number: 1138740
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing funding to restore a peal of bells to the Guild Church of St Dunstan-in-the-West, Fleet Street; and to carry out all necessary ancillary work to make this possible.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £755
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 November 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL NICHOL MOUNSEY Chair
ST MAGNUS THE MARTYR BELLS FUND
Received: On time
THE ANCIENT SOCIETY OF COLLEGE YOUTHS BELL RESTORATION FUND
Received: On time
ALAN REGIN MBE Trustee
BELLS4THEWESTERNFRONT
Received: 12 days late
Dickon Rutherford Love MBE Trustee
THE SHARPE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SHARPE COLLECTION TRUST
Received: On time
ST MAGNUS THE MARTYR BELLS FUND
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MAGNUS THE MARTYR WITH ST MARGARET NEW FISH STREET AND ST MICHAEL CROOKED LANE, LONDON
Received: On time
MATTHEW OWEN BURROUGHS Trustee
THE GUILD CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE GUILD CHURCH OF ST DUNSTAN-IN-THE-WEST, FLEET STREET, LONDON
Recently registered
DAVID POWELL Trustee
THE GUILD CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE GUILD CHURCH OF ST DUNSTAN-IN-THE-WEST, FLEET STREET, LONDON
Recently registered
JOHN BISHOP CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £832 £0 £0 £291 £755
Total expenditure £47 £423 £900 £365 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 July 2024 266 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 July 2024 631 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 March 2022 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 December 2020 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 WHARTON ROAD
BROMLEY
BR1 3LF
Phone:
07983352279
Website:

No information available