AID IN MEDICARE & EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RAISING FUNDS FOR THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL ASSISTANCE AND AID IN HOSPITALS IN INDIA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- India
Governance
- 10 November 2011: Standard registration
- AIME (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SURINDER SINGH SOOR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ron Enticott | Trustee | 05 June 2009 |
|
|||||
SUKHBINDER SINGH SOOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51 | £12 | £504 | £203 | £666 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £5.00k | £0 | £220 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/06/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/06/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/10/2011
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH IN INDIA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR MEDICAL TREATMENT AND CARE IN THE PUNJAB REGION OF INDIA, INCLUDING THE SUPPORT OF A HOSPITAL B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN INDIA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES IN VILLAGE SCHOOLS IN PUNJAB, INDIA. C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND HARDSHIP IN INDIA BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT AND ADVICE FOR COMMUNITY PROJECTS AND INDIVIDUALS WITH THE FOCUS ON DEVELOPING SKILLS TO ENABLE THEM TO IMPROVE THEIR STANDARD OF LIVING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
AIRDE ACCOUNTANCY
83 CHURCH ROAD
ADDLESTONE
KT15 1SF
- Phone:
- 01932848408
- Email:
- ron.airde@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window