THE ECUMENICAL COUNCIL FOR CORPORATE RESPONSIBILITY (ECCR)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Ecumenical Council for Corporate Responsibility's core charitable objective is to prevent and relieve poverty, and to advance environmental protection, human rights, conflict resolution, citizenship and community development, by promoting business ethics, corporate responsibility and ethical investment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 31 December 2010: Standard registration
- ECCR (Working name)
- JustMoney Movement (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Geoffrey Alastair Moore | Chair | 11 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Naomi Sterling | Trustee | 31 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeroen Christopher Bromilow | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
SIMEON JOSEPH MITCHELL | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Austin Matthew Richards | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDREW JOHN TREHARNE | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lees RICHARDSON | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Denise Wilkinson | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
GRACE BALLY-BALOGUN | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Richard Miles Johnson | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|||||
The Rev'd Dr Simon Lloyd Cuff | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ARTHUR HASLAM | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.04k | £204.27k | £224.08k | £244.71k | £199.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.95k | £165.66k | £161.12k | £194.43k | £217.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 NOVEMBER 1992 as amended on 10 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO:- 1. PREVENT AND RELIEVE POVERTY, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS; 2. SEEK THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; 3. ADVANCE ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AND PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT (MEANING DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS); 4. ADVANCE HUMAN RIGHTS, CONFLICT RESOLUTION OR RECONCILIATION; AND 5. ADVANCE CITIZENSHIP AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT; FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD BY: (A) UNDERTAKING RESEARCH (AND MAKING AVAILABLE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH) INTO, AND EDUCATING CHURCH AND OTHER FAITH COMMUNITY MEMBERS AND THE WIDER PUBLIC ABOUT: (I) THE BUSINESS ETHICS, INCLUDING THE CORPORATE GOVERNANCE, CORPORATE RESPONSIBILITY AND COMMUNITY INVOLVEMENT POLICIES AND PRACTICES OF COMMERCIAL COMPANIES, FIRMS AND OTHER BUSINESSES OPERATING NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY, AND (II) THE DIRECT AND INDIRECT EFFECT OF BUSINESS ACTIVITIES ON PEOPLE AND THE ENVIRONMENT; AND (B) ENGAGING WITH COMMERCIAL COMPANIES, FIRMS AND OTHER BUSINESSES OPERATING NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY TO ENCOURAGE THEM TO ADOPT AND APPLY HIGH STANDARDS OF BUSINESS ETHICS AND GOVERNANCE AND THEREBY MINIMISE THE NEGATIVE EFFECTS OF BUSINESS ACTIVITIES ON PEOPLE AND THE ENVIRONMENT AFFECTED BY SUCH ACTIVITIES, AND (C) ENGAGING WITH CHURCH INVESTORS AND OTHER INVESTORS IN COMPANIES, FIRMS AND OTHER BUSINESSES TO ENCOURAGE ETHICAL INVESTMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND ACTIVE INVESTOR ENGAGEMENT WITH SAID COMPANIES, FIRMS AND OTHER BUSINESSES WITH A VIEW TO ENCOURAGING THEM TO ADOPT AND APPLY HIGH STANDARDS OF BUSINESS ETHICS AND GOVERNANCE AND THEREBY MINIMISE THE NEGATIVE EFFECTS OF BUSINESS ACTIVITIES ON PEOPLE AND THE ENVIRONMENT AFFECTED BY SUCH ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 BUTE STREET
SHEFFIELD
S10 1UP
- Phone:
- 07557173370
- Email:
- info@justmoney.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window