KICC NATIONAL FORUM - UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian Religion; and, the furtherance of the charitable work of the Charity by the advancement of such other charitable purposes as the Trustees shall from time to time decide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 January 2011: Standard registration
- KICC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oladele Oluyemi | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Elegbede | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oluwatobi Ashimolowo | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR KARL DENNIS | Trustee | 20 May 2017 |
|
|||||
MRS ADE D'ALMEIDA | Trustee | 14 July 2011 |
|
|||||
ANDY YAWSON | Trustee | 14 July 2011 |
|
|||||
JAMES MCGLASHAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
MINISTER ABIMBOLA OLAIDE ODUNSI | Trustee |
|
||||||
Rev YEMISI ASHIMOLOWO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev ESTHER NESOTA DUNMOYE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOEL OGUNDAYO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TREVLYN AGATHA SHILLINGFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev OLADIPO ADEBAYO OLUYOMI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.86k | £88.41k | £95.25k | £96.43k | £69.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.55k | £45.84k | £59.96k | £11.42k | £224.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 OCTOBER 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC:- 3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION; 3.2 TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF OTHER CHARITIES WHOSE OBJECTS ARE SIMILAR TO THOSE OF THE CHARITY; AND 3.3 THE FURTHERANCE OF THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
KICC PRAYER CITY
BUCKMORE PARK
MAIDSTONE ROAD
CHATHAM
KENT
ME5 9QG
- Phone:
- 02085250000
- Email:
- forum@kicc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window