Financial history OPERATION HERNIA

Charity number: 1138936
Charity reporting is up to date (125 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £153.60k £25.48k £21.97k £121.82k £56.87k
Total expenditure £110.77k £63.64k £15.25k £132.30k £81.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A