BRUGES-NATOLIN UK EUROPEAN SCHOLARSHIPS FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scholarships for a year's tuition awarded to three successful applicants from the UK for the College of Europe, who would otherwise have been unable or found it difficult to accept the places offered to them. Publicising the availability of the scholarships and raising the money to finance them from willing donors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belgium
- Northern Ireland
- Poland
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 December 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Randal Edward Denman | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Richard Charles Washington | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Alan Gordon | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sir Martin Eugene Donnelly KCB, CMG | Trustee | 22 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW RENSHAW | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARIE LOUISE KINSLER KC | Trustee | 20 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JOYCE CARY CMG | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR DAME HELEN SARAH WALLACE | Trustee |
|
||||||
LADY MOYA FRANCES GABRIELLE DENMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.52k | £57.66k | £72.10k | £56.24k | £54.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.92k | £61.17k | £48.49k | £63.22k | £74.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 03/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 07/11/2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS ORDINARILY RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT THE COLLEGE OF EUROPE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 ST. LUKE'S STREET
LONDON
SW3 3RP
- Phone:
- 02073523199
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
brunatscholars.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window