THE TWO WALTERS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making of grants and/or advice to deserving individuals and institutions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of London
Governance
- 04 February 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Hudson | Trustee | 29 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS DOVE | Trustee | 13 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD SMITH | Trustee | 31 October 2010 |
|
|
||||
MARK HUDSON | Trustee | 31 October 2010 |
|
|||||
MICHAL GIEDROYC | Trustee | 31 October 2010 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.03k | £25.23k | £9.33k | £29.24k | £13.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.37k | £33.97k | £12.79k | £44.61k | £12.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2021
(These accounts |
23 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2020
(These accounts |
03 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR IN SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 1. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. 2. THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT. 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE. 4. THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: (I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES.
Area of benefit
SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
AG Tax Ltd
28 Austin Friars
LONDON
EC2N 2QQ
- Phone:
- 02035408910
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window