Financial history DOMINASE DEVELOPMENT - BURITON VILLAGE-TO-VILLAGE GROUP

Charity number: 1139835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.00k £1.97k £4.53k £7.08k £8.84k
Total expenditure £4.56k £2.63k £850 £3.68k £2.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A