THE JACK O'DONNELL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Childrens Sport and Medical charity supporting sporting opportunities for children as well as life changing medical support for children in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 04 May 2011: Standard registration
- JODF (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID O'DONNELL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ALISON HIRST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID HUNT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.01k | £7.77k | £21.23k | £976 | £22.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.51k | £20.87k | £9.65k | £11.45k | £21.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 10 August 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/04/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/04/2011
Charitable objects
4.1 TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH CREATING, PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING SPORTING OPPORTUNITIES WHICH WILL DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS 4.2 THE RELIEF OF SIELMESS OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN NEED OF LIFE CHANGING/SAVING MEDICAL TREAMENT OR REHABILITATION BY IMPROVING THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Cotmore Field
THAME
Oxfordshire
OX9 3GW
- Phone:
- 07770815494
- Email:
- admin@jodf.org.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window