THE LAWYERS' CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Lawyers' Christian Fellowship is an association of over 1,500 Christian lawyers and law student members. It took over the activities of registered charity 1017695 on 01/01/11. The LCF through its charitable objects promotes the Christian faith particularly in the legal profession and seeks to relieve poverty in accordance with the Christian faith primarily by supporting access to justice work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Burundi
- Kenya
- Northern Ireland
- Rwanda
- Scotland
- Uganda
Governance
- LCF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Robert George Bolster | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Vivienne McKoy-Salt | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Benjamin Edward Fullbrook | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy David Grainger | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Ann Underwood | Trustee | 22 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janys Margaret Scott QC | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £316.11k | £173.62k | £266.50k | £268.57k | £255.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £353.60k | £212.40k | £282.54k | £276.16k | £281.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £514 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 OCTOBER 2010 as amended on 23 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND AND INTERNATIONALLY IN PARTICULAR BY WORKING WITH THE LEGAL PROFESSION; AND (II) TO RELIEVE POVERTY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
IN PARTICULAR THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND, KENYA, RWANDA AND UGANDA
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Lawyers Christian Fellowship
8 Marshalsea Road
LONDON
SE1 1HL
- Phone:
- 02074076157
- Email:
- admin@lawcf.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window