Koala North West

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Koala North West offers emotional and practical support to families. We aim to strengthen and widen the social support network of families. Volunteers, who are parents themselves are carefully matched to the needs of the family; they then visit the family at home, building a strong supportive relationship offering friendship, reassurance and practical help.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,317,423
Donations and legacies | £41.95k | |
Charitable activities | £1.10m | |
Other trading activities | £161.07k | |
Investments | £11.50k | |
Other | £2.40k |
Total expenditure:
£1,564,277
Raising funds | £157.22k | |
Charitable activities | £1.41m | |
Other | £837 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £519,809 from 6 government contract(s) and £123,167 from 8 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £158.06k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.41m |
People

55 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
189 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Halton
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Warrington
- Wirral
Governance
- 23 December 2010: Standard registration
- 14 September 2011: Funds received from 1078806 HOME-START WIRRAL
- HOME-START WIRRAL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR RON KEARNEY | Chair | 20 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Caroline McKenna | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Oates | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katie Austin | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Penny Bishop | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Charlotte Owen | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laurie Hough | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Allan Folwell | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr FRANCES ELIZABETH WHITE DR | Trustee | 12 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £632.13k | £1.25m | £1.09m | £1.71m | £1.32m | |
|
Total expenditure | £611.82k | £965.61k | £1.01m | £1.34m | £1.56m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £205.78k | £177.60k | £205.78k | £472.43k | £519.81k | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.33k | £375.44k | £372.20k | £527.02k | £123.17k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £411.72k | £987.48k | £732.52k | £1.23m | £41.95k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £108.95k | £39.55k | £132.12k | £152.08k | £161.07k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £111.44k | £206.83k | £216.91k | £311.60k | £1.10m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £20 | £6 | £16 | £2.91k | £11.50k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £18.56k | £3.45k | £13.94k | £2.40k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £493.09k | £865.44k | £898.78k | £1.22m | £1.41m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £118.41k | £100.16k | £107.85k | £127.93k | £157.22k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £29.08k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £252.99k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £320 | £9 | £338 | £480 | £837 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £138.28k | £139.47k | £141.14k | £137.43k | £144.32k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £340.53k | |
|
Other assets | £179.40k | £434.41k | £527.35k | £1.06m | £571.78k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £42.89k | £12.28k | £28.84k | £187.97k | £294.69k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/07/2010 as amended on 23 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: A) TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; B) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN; C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; D) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE; PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE AREA OF WIRRAL AND ITS ENVIRONS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT")
Area of benefit
WIRRAL AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Koala North West
Woodchurch Lane
Birkenhead
Wirral
CH42 9PH
- Phone:
- 01516088288
- Email:
- admin@koalanw.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window