TIPTREE YOUTH PROJECT OUTREACH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) To advance in life and relieve needs of young people living in Tiptree and the surrounding area through: (a) The provision of recreational and leisure time activities (b) Providing support and activities which develop their skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society. 2) To advance the Christian religion for the benefit of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £1,890 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 19 May 2011: Standard registration
- TYPO (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FATHER GORDON READ | Chair | 19 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Eric Wilson | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
BARRY WARNER | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN MARK GREENWOOD | Trustee | 21 July 2015 |
|
|||||
JULIAN WYNCOLL | Trustee | 16 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND ANNE-MARIE LOUISE RENSHAW | Trustee | 05 October 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.34k | £13.88k | £15.89k | £22.46k | £39.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.65k | £19.85k | £28.39k | £26.87k | £29.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.00k | £1.50k | £1.59k | £1.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 04/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 12 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN TIPTREE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 2) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Luke's Church
Church Road
Tiptree
Colchester
Essex
CO5 0SU
- Phone:
- 01621815260
- Email:
- julian@tileandco.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window