The Centre For Entrepreneurs

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Centre for Entrepreneurs is an entrepreneurship foundation. We work to make the country more entrepreneurial. Our activities focus on advancing the entrepreneurship agenda for the UK, through: Delivering entrepreneurial development programmes; Researching the state of entrepreneurship and how to unlock potential in neglected groups; Building thriving entrepreneurial communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 January 2011: Standard registration
- THE NEW ENTREPRENEURS FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oliver John Woodforde Pawle | Chair |
|
||||||
Carolyn Dawson | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Santinon | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Hubback | Trustee | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOY | Trustee | 19 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
DEIRDRE MARIE STIRLING | Trustee | 18 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.60m | £894.08k | £1.46m | £462.36k | £479.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.46m | £973.82k | £974.07k | £938.05k | £644.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £189.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £71.55k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.04m | £725.31k | £1.33m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £220.82k | £61.10k | £78.15k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £335.70k | £107.67k | £49.92k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £78 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £3 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.37m | £939.76k | £945.41k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £87.17k | £34.06k | £28.65k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £55.81k | £63.74k | £40.22k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 DECEMBER 2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 OCT 2017 as amended on 14 May 2019
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN BUSINESS AND ENTREPRENEURSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, INCLUDING BY: (A) THE TEACHING OF BUSINESS AND ENTREPRENEURSHIP SKILLS THROUGH SEMINARS, LECTURES, TRAINING COURSES; (B) THE FUNDING OF AND THE PROVISION FOR YOUNG PEOPLE TO UNDERTAKE BUSINESS INTERNSHIPS; AND (C) FUNDING AND UNDERTAKING STUDY AND RESEARCH IN BUSINESS AND ENTREPRENEURSHIP, PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE; AND (2) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING: (A) THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH BUSINESS TRAINING; (B) BRINGING TOGETHER COMMERCIAL PARTNERS, LOCAL AND NATIONAL GOVERNMENT AND PHILANTHROPIC AND CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF HARDSHIP OR OTHER FINANCIAL NEED THROUGH HELP IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS; AND (C) TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT THE REHABILITATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE OR HAVE PREVIOUSLY BEEN PRISONERS BY THE PROMOTION AND PROVISION OF BUSINESS EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN PRISONS AND FOR INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE JUST BEEN RELEASED FROM PRISON.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Arundel St
c/o Founders Forum - 6th floor
London
England
WC2R 3DA
- Phone:
- 07432559563
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window