YESHIVA GEDOILAH TORAH VEYIRAH LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operation of talmumdical college in North London for Jewish boys ages 16-18. Includes academic centre as well as provision of leisure and recreational facilities. Provision of grants to organisations carrying out similar activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hackney
Governance
- 01 April 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOEL ROTHBART | Trustee | 04 April 2011 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
BERISH BERGER | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||
ABRAHAM PADWA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £387.05k | £371.24k | £313.96k | £413.78k | £460.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £410.96k | £320.13k | £389.63k | £460.83k | £463.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £50.00k | £16.36k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 11 December 2023 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 11 December 2023 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/03/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/03/2011
Charitable objects
I. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH II.THE ADVANCEMENT OF ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE MANAGEMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF THE TALMUDICAL COLLEGE KNOWN AS YESHIVA GEDOILAH TORAH VEYIRAH IN NORTH LONDON III.TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE LEISURE & RECREATION FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR YOUNG JEWISH PEOPLE WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE IV.THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE JEWISH FAITH V.THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER OBJECTS AS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
98 OSBALDESTON ROAD
LONDON
N16 6NL
- Phone:
- 07966017090
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window