IMAGE AND PREGNANCY HELPLINE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operates a pregnancy telephone helpline; provides support for pregnancy crisis, post-abortion and child loss; provides baby clothes and equipment; runs specialised training courses for pregnancy centre workers, pastoral care workers and counsellors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 May 2011: Standard registration
- 24 October 2011: Funds received from 1088573 IMAGE
- 15 April 2024: Funds received from 1082688 NOTTINGHAM PREGNANCY CRISIS CENTRE
- 15 April 2024: Funds received from 1082688 NOTTINGHAM PREGNANCY CRISIS CENTRE
- 16 August 2024: Funds received from 1135434 CHOICES COUNSELLING BUXTON CIO
- IMAGE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rhea Charis Tatchell | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARGARET ANDERS | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE MARY FIDLER | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Timothy Bull | Trustee | 09 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.26k | £43.12k | £40.21k | £51.51k | £35.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.65k | £31.54k | £41.89k | £42.91k | £52.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/12/2010 as amended on 08 May 2024
Charitable objects
a. To preserve and protect the good health both mental and physical of those in pregnancy crisis or with pregnancy loss. b. To relieve the poverty, sickness and distress of those who are pregnant or suffering with pregnancy loss, including termination, miscarriage, baby loss or separation. c. To promote education and research in the subject of pregnancy and termination of pregnancy and into its effects, whether physical, medical, psychological or social. d. To promote the Christian faith, in particular the value of all people from beginning to end, by providing training, education and services.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Wesley Centre
Royce Road
MANCHESTER
M15 5BP
- Phone:
- 01612738090
- Email:
- office@imagenet.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window