RENNIE GROVE HOSPICE CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rennie Grove Hospice Care provides palliative care for adults and children who have been diagnosed with cancer or another life limiting illness in Herts and Bucks. Through our 24/7 responsive hospice at home service, our specialist nurses give patients the choice to be cared for at home. We also offer support services for families and, in Herts, a range of day services for patients & families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£8,315,000
Donations and legacies | £2.35m | |
Charitable activities | £2.85m | |
Other trading activities | £2.44m | |
Investments | £262.00k | |
Other | £414.00k |
Total expenditure:
£18,852,000
Raising funds | £2.46m | |
Charitable activities | £2.46m | |
Other | £13.94m |
£272,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £16.40m | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.46m |
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- IAIN RENNIE GROVE HOUSE HOSPICE CARE (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jeremy Stephen Shindler | Chair | 26 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Maria Vivian Ball | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|||||||||||
Clifford Andrew Speed | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|||||||||||
Joanne Lesley Langfield | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Julie Morosco | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Richard Russell-Hogg | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Erika Hope Moralez-Perez | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Seema Hill | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Alan Philip Graham MBE | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Stephen Richard Hamill | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Martin John Ferguson | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
JOHN VINCENT WROE | Trustee | 27 July 2017 |
|
|||||||||||
Chris Inman | Trustee | 02 June 2016 |
|
|||||||||||
Dr Alexandra Jeannette Rosalind Wainwright | Trustee | 07 August 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.61m | £11.86m | £13.06m | £10.23m | £8.32m | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.14m | £8.78m | £9.36m | £9.94m | £18.85m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £3.21m | £2.15m | £1.89m | £2.57m | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £553.77k | £3.06m | £1.37m | £140.53k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.23m | £3.77m | £5.80m | £3.22m | £2.35m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £3.89m | £1.32m | £3.37m | £3.75m | £2.44m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.56m | £5.21m | £3.26m | £2.63m | £2.85m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £15.61k | £10.18k | £10.27k | £73.01k | £262.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £922.71k | £1.56m | £615.67k | £558.86k | £414.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.06m | £1.26m | £3.38m | £1.30m | £397.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.40m | £5.64m | £5.52m | £5.65m | £2.46m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.74m | £3.14m | £3.84m | £4.29m | £2.46m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £50.75k | £38.95k | £110.92k | £77.70k | £207.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £13.94m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.77m | £2.74m | £2.55m | £3.76m | £1.01m | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.36m | £2.80m | £3.94m | £3.76m | £2.61m | |
|
Other assets | £4.44m | £7.91m | £10.12m | £9.12m | £1.47m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.46m | £1.81m | £1.11m | £1.12m | £455.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/04/2013 as amended on 15 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
4.1. THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED (THE "OBJECTS") ARE TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING): 4.1.1. TO ESTABLISH, MAINTAIN AND CONDUCT RESIDENTIAL HOME(S) AND OR DAY CARE CENTRE(S) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE RECEPTION AND CARE OF PERSONS OF EITHER SEX (WITHOUT REGARD TO RACE, RELIGION OR CREED) WHO ARE SUFFERING (AT ANY AGE) FROM CHRONIC OR TERMINAL ILLNESS OR FROM ANY DISABILITY OR DISEASE WHETHER ATTRIBUTABLE TO OLD AGE OR OTHERWISE, AND TO PROVIDE MEDICAL OR OTHER TREATMENT AND ATTENTION FOR SUCH PERSONS AS AFORESAID IN THEIR OWN HOMES EITHER FREE OF CHARGE OR SUBJECT TO SUCH PAYMENT AS THE CHARITY MAY THINK FIT; 4.1.2. TO CONDUCT, PUBLISH, PROMOTE OR ENCOURAGE RESEARCH INTO THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ANY SUCH ILLNESS, DISABILITY, DISEASE OR INFIRMITY AS AFORESAID, AND PARTICULARLY (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) INTO THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CANCER OR TERMINAL ILLNESS, AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS THEREOF TO THE PUBLIC; 4.1.3. TO PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE OR ASSIST IN THE TEACHING OR TRAINING OF DOCTORS, NURSES, PHYSIOTHERAPISTS AND OTHER PERSONS ENGAGED IN ANY BRANCH OF MEDICINE, SURGERY, NURSING OR ALLIED SERVICES, AND IN THE TEACHING OR TRAINING OF STUDENTS IN ANY BRANCH OF MEDICINE, SURGERY, NURSING OR ALLIED SERVICES; 4.1.4. TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM CONCERNING THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ANY SUCH ILLNESS, DISABILITY, DISEASE OR INFIRMITY AS AFORESAID, AND PARTICULARLY (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) INTO THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CANCER OR TERMINAL ILLNESS, AND TO PROVIDE INFORMATION SERVICES FOR THOSE PATIENTS AND THEIR CARERS, FAMILIES AND FRIENDS IN CONNECTION WITH THEIR CARE AND TREATMENT; 4.1.5. TO PROVIDE, ASSIST OR ENCOURAGE THE PROVISION OF SPIRITUAL HELP, GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT FOR ANY SUCH PATIENTS AND THEIR CARERS, FAMILIES AND/OR FRIENDS, AND PERSONS WORKING IN ANY SUCH DAY CENTRE(S), HOME OR HOMES AS AFORESAID AND TO INCLUDE THE PROVISION OF A PLACE OF WORSHIP.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
GROVE HOUSE
WAVERLEY ROAD
ST. ALBANS
AL3 5QX
- Phone:
- 01442890222
- Email:
- sam.kinnear@renniegrove.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window