THE SHROPSHIRE HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity continues to fulfil the requirements of its primary objective, being the promotion of horticultural education. This has been achieved by organising the annual Shrewsbury Flower Show, organising lectures on horticultural events, supporting, through the Percy Thrower Bursary the Young Horticulturist of the Year competition and by making charitable donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income:
£742,666
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £454.91k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £287.76k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,203,080
Raising funds | £884.06k | |
Charitable activities | £319.02k | |
Other | £0 |
-£48,713 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £884.06k | |
Charitable expenditure | £319.02k |
People

5 Employee(s)
26 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Shropshire
Governance
- 15 April 1992: Standard registration
- SHREWSBURY FLOWER SHOW (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
26 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IDRIS MAELOR OWEN | Chair |
|
||||||||
Jessica Moody | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
John Richard Lucas | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Titley | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
David Hulton-Harrop | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Mary Rowlands | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rebecca Chew | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
KENNETH WILLIAM TONKIN | Trustee | 16 June 2019 |
|
|||||||
Lindsay Pearson | Trustee | 08 February 2016 |
|
|||||||
PETER ROAD-KNIGHT | Trustee | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
||||||
COL MARK CUTHBERT-BROWN | Trustee | 14 February 2013 |
|
|
||||||
MR B GOODWIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
TONY BYWATER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MRS D HAMER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MR E T B BUTCHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MR S J KYNASTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MR G PARRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MR C CHEW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MR R E KEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MR R J WHITTINGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MR H WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MR M W BURTON BSC (HONS) TECHRICS FN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MAJ B K HARPER OSEJ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MR J MCA HODGSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
STEPHEN CHARLES ROGERS | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MR A D CROSS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £953.05k | £235.68k | £245.89k | £796.77k | £742.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.14m | £301.90k | £341.58k | £1.46m | £1.20m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £689.32k | N/A | N/A | £527.19k | £454.91k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £260.73k | N/A | N/A | £269.58k | £287.76k | |
|
Income - Other | £3.00k | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.10m | N/A | N/A | £296.38k | £319.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £36.91k | N/A | N/A | £1.16m | £884.06k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £15.05k | N/A | N/A | £12.33k | £15.67k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £17.50k | N/A | N/A | £15.00k | £26.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £36.91k | N/A | N/A | £24.55k | £20.28k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £291.55k | N/A | N/A | £261.11k | £269.48k | |
|
Long-term investments | £7.52m | N/A | N/A | £6.86m | £6.50m | |
|
Other assets | £289.36k | N/A | N/A | £405.17k | £221.35k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £137.28k | N/A | N/A | £116.94k | £90.97k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 March 2024 | 225 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 11 March 2024 | 225 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 31 July 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 31 July 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 FEBRUARY 1972 AS AMENDED 2 FEBRUARY 1976 , 14TH FEBRUARY 1983 AND 7 FEBRUARY 2001.
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE HORTICULTURAL EDUCATION BY HOLDING A SHOW OR SHOWS AND COMPETITIONS EACH YEAR, BY ARRANGING CONFERENCES, LECTURES AND VISITS TO PLACES OF HORTICULTURAL INTEREST AND BY ENCOURAGING, IMPROVING AND EXTENDING THE CULTIVATION OF GARDENS AND OPEN SPACES. (B) TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH HORTICULTURE AS THE GENERAL COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. (C) TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND TO ASSIST SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AS THE SOCIETY SHALL IN LIKE MANNER DETERMINE (WHETHER OR NOT SUCH OTHER PURPOSES OR ORGANISATIONS ARE CONNECTED WITH HORTICULTURE) ESPECIALLY IF SUCH PURPOSE IS IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 15 April 1992 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
QUARRY LODGE
SHREWSBURY
SHROPSHIRE
SY1 1RN
- Phone:
- 01743234052
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window