RIVER OF LIFE CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To be a strong and lively Church where the gifts, talents and abilities of each person can be discovered and fulfilled, able and willing to reach out and meet the needs of the community, with the intention of bringing them to a commitment to Jesus Christ and then leading them on into a productive Christian life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 24 January 2011: Standard registration
- 23 November 2011: Funds received from 287950 RIVER OF LIFE CHRISTIAN CENTRE
- THE WESTBURY FULL GOSPEL CHURCH (OLD NAME) (Working name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Iain Peter Williams | Chair | 10 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
DARREN TORRINGTON | Trustee | 07 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev STEPHEN PHILIP VIJENDAR CHAUDHARY | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANDREW CHRISTAKI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.61k | £49.27k | £53.48k | £64.03k | £68.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.04k | £52.35k | £50.73k | £24.25k | £49.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 December 2023 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 December 2023 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 December 2020 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 December 2020 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/11/2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN BRISTOL AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES INCLUDING THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY FACILITIES WHICH ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 TRYM ROAD
BRISTOL
BS9 3EP
- Phone:
- 01179507189
- Email:
- admin@riveroflife.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window