Trustees THE NORTHUMBRIAN PIPERS' SOCIETY
Charity number: 1142471

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW DAVISON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
The Very Rev'd Geoff Miller | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alex Matthew Barrass | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Douglass | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Norman Douglas | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Jessica Rothman | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gregory McCormick | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Ratliff | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Helen Capes | Trustee | 07 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Owen Syson | Trustee | 10 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Iain Alexander Gelston | Trustee | 18 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Lawrenson | Trustee | 19 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
STANLEY ANDREW MAY | Trustee | 27 March 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.