UNIVERSITY OF YORK GRADUATE STUDENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The GSA aims to provide a social community for postgraduates through our dedicated postgraduate welcome week, regular events, trips and free sport. We represent postgraduate views on a variety of university committees, provide academic, welfare support and offers advice on all postgraduate matters. Furthermore the GSA provides services to the University's large and diverse postgraduate community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 13 June 2011: Standard registration
- YORK GSA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Sandison | Chair | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Exon | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Kate Williams | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sinead Daly | Trustee | 14 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Dominic Smithies | Trustee | 14 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £292.18k | £306.27k | £375.49k | £376.71k | £340.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £252.83k | £322.17k | £431.89k | £428.26k | £326.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 July 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 23 July 2021 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM 24 NOV 2010 as amended on 01 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
-PROMOTE AND DEFEND THE EDUCATIONAL AND GENERAL INTERESTS OF THE MEMBERS AND BE THE RECOGNISED REPRESENTATIVE CHANNEL BETWEEN THEM, THE UNIVERSITY AND OTHER EXTERNAL BODIES; -FURTHER THE SOCIAL INTERESTS OF THE MEMBERS TO PROMOTE THE INTEGRATION AND SOCIAL COHESION OF MEMBERS AND NON-MEMBERS; -IMPROVE COMMUNICATION BETWEEN GRADUATES AND UNDERGRADUATES AT THE -UNIVERSITY BY WORKING IN CONJUNCTION WITH REPRESENTATIVE BODIES OF UNDERGRADUATE STUDENTS; -ESTABLISH CONTACT WITH OTHER GRADUATE STUDENT BODIES AND FACILITATE THE EXCHANGE OF STUDENTS AND BEST PRACTICE BETWEEN INSTITUTIONS; -RAISE THE PROFILE OF POSTGRADUATE STUDY AT THE UNIVERSITY HEREBY SUPPORTING THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; -PROVIDE ACADEMIC AND WELFARE RELATED SERVICES TO MEMBERS AND NON-MEMBERS; -PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL POSTGRADUATE STUDENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY TO PARTICIPATE IN SPORTING OR SOCIAL ACTIVITIES. -FURTHER SUCH POLICIES OF THE COMPANY AS ARE FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINED BY THE MEMBERS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ARTICLES, AND TO PROVIDE ANY OTHER SERVICES AS CONSIDERED NECESSARY IN PURSUIT OF THESE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIVERSITY OF YORK
HESLINGTON
YORK
YO10 5DD
- Phone:
- 01904323712
- Email:
- info@yorkgsa.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window