Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARGARET WITH ST NICHOLAS AND ST EDMUND KING'S LYNN

Charity number: 1140015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £125.74k £146.78k £802.77k £267.01k £193.00k
Total expenditure £168.49k £143.67k £648.66k £538.42k £247.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.47k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £105.36k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £8.11k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £12.69k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £676.61k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £2.50k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £1.28k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £1.78k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £645.60k N/A N/A