Financial history ST JOHN'S LITTLE LEARNERS DAY NURSERY

Charity number: 1141846
Charity reporting is overdue by 451 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £141.73k £131.50k £161.74k £143.91k £160.12k
Total expenditure £139.29k £142.50k £163.70k £160.92k £152.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £130.45k £120.16k £141.24k £135.98k £144.51k