THINK MALAWI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with Malawians on educational projects improving access to quality education, allowing them to fulfil their ambitions and improve their quality of life. We continue to work hand in hand with award-winning, high achieving nursery/ primary school Ganet's Adventure School, as we have done since 2011. We are run by volunteers enabling over 90% of our income to go direct to projects in Malawi.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Southwark
- Malawi
Governance
- 12 April 2011: Standard registration
- GASF (Working name)
- GANET'S ADVENTURE SCHOOL FUND (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alastair Corbett | Chair | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olufolakemi Banjo | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Saniya Patel | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Rose | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Mendez | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Andrew George Scott Baker | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE HAUXWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR STEVE MCINERNY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.89k | £18.63k | £16.93k | £6.09k | £21.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.15k | £25.41k | £16.95k | £9.47k | £15.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUSTDEED 03 AUG 2009 AS AMENDED ON 15 MAY 2018 as amended on 10 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
To advance the education of children and adults in Malawi.
Contact information
- Address:
-
59 Delawyk Crescent
LONDON
SE24 9JD
- Phone:
- 02072073599
- Email:
- info@thinkmalawi.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window