THE SECOND HALF FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote for the benefit of the inhabitants of North Kensington and the surrounding area, over the age of 50, by the provision of recreation facilities or leisure time occupation of those who need such facilities by reason of their age, infirmity or disablement, financial hardship or social and economic circumstances with the object of improving the conditions of the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 18 May 2011: Standard registration
- THE SECOND HALF OF YOUR LIFE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lady Jill Shaw Ruddock | Chair |
|
||||||
Sophie Anna Ruddock | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Diane Herlinger | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
SIR PAUL RUDDOCK | Trustee | 18 May 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.49k | £833 | £88.11k | £88.08k | £119.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.00k | £46.36k | £95.27k | £97.82k | £46.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 29 April 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 29 April 2024 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11/03/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NORTH KENSINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE OVER THE AGE OF 50 BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 LANSDOWNE WALK
LONDON
W11 3LN
- Phone:
- 02077920424
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window