WHADDON VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The hall and recreation ground is regularly used for a variety of activities for villagers and nearby businesses and recreation clubs. The hall is available for hire for private functions including childrens parties, wedding receptions, village functions, elections and occasional fund raising fairs. During FY 2013/14, refurbishment was completed using funds from reserves and grants received.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 22 March 2011: Standard registration
- WVHRGT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Birch | Chair | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Hales | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marine Boulter | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Gabrielle van Poortvliet | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Coningsby | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Steve Argent | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
KAREN CONINGSBY | Trustee | 22 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER HASELDEN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.30k | £13.79k | £9.16k | £13.13k | £13.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.27k | £6.15k | £6.34k | £9.11k | £9.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 March 2022 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TrustDeed
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY AND THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED FOR THE PURPOSES OF: A. A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WHADDON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE OF THE PROPERTY FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES OR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS: B. A RECREATION GROUND FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WHADDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 Bridge Street
Whaddon
ROYSTON
Hertfordshire
SG8 5SQ
- Phone:
- 01223207434
- Email:
- whaddonhalltrust@whaddon.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window