KALEIDOSCOPE ENTERPRISE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to enable children, young people, older people, community groups and businesses to access equality of opportunity by offering support, information, advocacy and research in Welwyn Hatfield and neighbouring areas. This is currently delivered through our strategic representation, public and community events, in particular Kaleidoscope Festival, training and mentoring programmes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Total income includes £29,282 from government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 10 March 2011: Standard registration
- 08 March 2013: Funds received from 1110122 THE WELWYN HATFIELD ETHNIC MINORITY (WHEM) GROUP
- 28 January 2019: Funds transferred to 1075224 COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT ACTION HERTFORDSHIRE
- 28 January 2019: Funds transferred to 1141647 A MUTUALLY ASSOCIATED DEPTFORD COMMUNITY ARTS PROJ...
- 28 January 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £134.65k | £79.71k | £19.17k | £32.78k | £52.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.91k | £56.85k | £36.94k | £40.45k | £52.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £29.28k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 16 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2017
(These accounts |
16 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 30 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
30 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 29 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/10/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/10/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF MINORITY ETHNIC (BME) COMMUNITIES AND INDIVIDUALS IN WELWYN HATFIELD AND NEIGHBOURING DISTRICTS (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE DISTRICTS) AND, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS, SICKNESS AND UNEMPLOYMENT. TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER IN THE CHARITY'S REPRESENTATIVES OF BME VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
HERTFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window