Financial history NEW GREENWICH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1141023
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £95.11k £171.61k £150.51k £211.37k £169.93k
Total expenditure £59.00k £93.18k £136.44k £174.75k £170.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £84.66k £53.77k N/A £20.00k