THE MARITIME HERITAGE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The education of the public at large in relation to maritime heritage
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 April 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM FRANK CHASE | Trustee | 18 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL ANTHONY CHIMMO BRANSON | Trustee | 21 March 2011 |
|
|||||
Sir Robert Balchin | Trustee | 21 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.61k | £2.60k | £0 | £10.00k | £6.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.55k | £7.88k | £9.07k | £10.08k | £10.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/10/2010
Charitable objects
4. OBJECTS 4.1 THE COMPANY HAS BEEN ESTABLISHED FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: 4.2 THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN RELATION TO MARITIME HERITAGE BY ANY MEANS WHICH THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE; 4.3 WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE ABOVE, THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN RELATION TO MARITIME HERITAGE BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 4.3.1 THE LOCATION, EXCAVATION, RECOVERY, RAISING, RESTORATION AND/OR PRESERVATION OF SHIP WRECKS AND THE CONTENTS THEREOF INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO HMS VICTORY AND/OR OTHER ITEMS OF MARITIME HERITAGE; 4.3.2 THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM AND/OR THE DEVELOPMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT EXHIBITION TO DISPLAY SHIP WRECKS AND THE CONTENTS THEREOF INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO HMS VICTORY AND/OR OTHER ITEMS OF MARITIME HERITAGE; AND/OR 4.3.3 THE ESTABLISHMENT, MAINTENANCE AND/OR GOVERNANCE OF A SCHOOL, COLLEGE, UNIVERSITY AND/OR INSTITUTE OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION TO PROMOTE KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF MARITIME HERITAGE; AND/OR 4.3.4 THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES, GRANTS AND/OR BURSARIES TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, COLLEGE, UNIVERSITY AND/OR INSTITUTE OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION FOR YOUNG PERSONS WISHING TO ATTEND SUCH INSTITUTIONS WITH A VIEW TO FURTHER THEIR KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF MARITIME HERITAGE; 4.3.5 THE ESTABLISHMENT AND PROMOTION OF A PRIZE, AWARD AND/OR FUND FOR INDIVIDUALS, GROUPS AND/OR ORGANISATIONS WHO HAVE CONTRIBUTED IN ANY WAY TO THE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND/OR AWARENESS OF MARITIME HERITAGE; 4.3.6 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONSISTENT WITH THE ABOVE AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE (TOGETHER THE "OBJECTS").
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 68
Surrey
RH7 6QQ
- Phone:
- 01622754033
- Email:
- lord.lingfield@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window