THE BISCUIT FACTORY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Facilitation of artist work spaces with the provision of artists, studios in 3 sites by providing affordable studio spaces, exhibition & sales opportunities & marketing support. We run a cultural programme of events, musical engagement & performance, cultural educational sessions. Our largest project to date, was the creation of a national painting competition entitled Young Artists of the Year;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 18 April 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAMY ZACK | Chair |
|
||||||
Simeon Zack | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER HILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RT HON NICK BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.41k | £100.83k | £202.28k | £209.28k | £218.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.86k | £84.71k | £197.72k | £197.24k | £209.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 November 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 November 2021 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/01/2011
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE VISUAL ARTS AMONGST INHABITANTS OF THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT"), IN BOTH RELIGIOUS AND NON-RELIGIOUS SETTINGS, AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY: (A) ESTABLISHING AN ARTISTS RESOURCE CENTRE AND A COMMUNITY CHURCH; (B) PROVIDING ARTISTIC WORKSHOPS AND ARTISTS STUDIOS; (C) PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL, PERFORMANCE AND EXHIBITION FACILITIES AND RESOURCES; (D) ENGAGING YOUNG PEOPLE IN ARTISTIC ACTIVITIES, INCLUDING PROVIDING MATERIALS AND FACILITIES FOR GRAPHITTI WRITING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BISCUIT FACTORY
STODDART STREET
SHIELDFIELD
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE2 1AN
- Phone:
- 01912615757
- Email:
- info@tbff.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window