THE RELITHAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1140843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General Charitable Purposes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 15 March 2024

Total income: £71,253
Total expenditure: £79,586

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 March 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ludlow Trust Company Ltd Trustee 05 July 2021
THE MARY STEPHANIE WARREN-COLEMAN TRUST
Received: On time
THE ROPER FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE KATHLEEN LAURENCE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PLASTOW FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE WESTCOTT FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE JECTUS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE HSWJ TRUST
Received: On time
THE J VAN MARS FOUNDATION
Received: 1 day late
THE THOMPSON6 CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE CARLILE FOUNDATION CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
PAULINE MEREDITH CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
JOSEPH ETTEDGUI CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE JOAN MARY WOODHAM HURRELL TRUST
Received: On time
THE TORNS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE WHITEWATER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ETTLING CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE DR CORAL IRMGARD ALLWORTHY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAYBACK TIME TRUST
Received: On time
THE REGINALD M PHILLIPS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CJM AND FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE CORTON HILL TRUST
Received: On time
THE FRAXINUS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE GNINWOD TRUST
Received: On time
MILLIE'S WATCH
Received: On time
THE ORKNEY CHERRY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE POLMAX CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE 4 BETTER FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE AITKEN FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE AQUEDUCT CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE BROWN SOURCE TRUST
Received: On time
THE CHIGA CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE EDWARD & CATHERINE WRAY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE HURST LEA FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE LINDLEY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MAURICE AND SUSAN ROTHSCHILD INCENTIVE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ROWLAND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE SAMUEL FELDMAN NORTH EAST CORNER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SCSJD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE LINDSAY TRUST
Received: On time
The Brindle Foundation
Received: On time
THE PRAFARATA FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE MARGARET ELIZABETH CORMACK CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE KENNETH MONTAGUE DICKINSON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE DISCWORLD FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DAVID WARREN ARTHUR EAST CBE Trustee 21 March 2011
None on record
Lady AMANDA HAZELL EAST Trustee 21 March 2011
THE KING'S SCHOOL, ELY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/03/2020 15/03/2021 15/03/2022 15/03/2023 15/03/2024
Total gross income £137.17k £525.39k £119.61k £62.28k £71.25k
Total expenditure £139.28k £295.52k £122.11k £249.78k £79.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £250.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £250.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £55.85k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £469.53k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £262.62k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £32.90k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.62k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £261.00k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £32.90k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 March 2024 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 March 2024 24 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 March 2023 10 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 March 2023 10 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 March 2021 24 January 2022 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 March 2021 24 January 2022 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ludlow Trust Co Ltd
Tower Wharf
Cheese Lane
BRISTOL
BS2 0JJ
Phone:
01173138200
Website:

No information available